List of Presidents of state of Chad:
01 |
François Tombalbaye |
Term of Office |
11 August 1960 – 13 April 1975 |
02 |
Félix Malloum |
Term of Office |
15 April 1975 – 23 March 1979 |
03 |
Goukouni Oueddei |
Term of Office |
23 March 1979 – 29 April 1979 |
04 |
Lol Mahamat Choua |
Term of Office |
29 April 1979 3 September 1979 |
05 |
Goukouni Oueddei |
Term of Office |
3 September 1979 – 7 June 1982 |
06 |
Hissène Habré |
Term of Office |
7 June 1982 – 2 December 1990 |
07 |
Idriss Déby |
Term of Office |
2 December 1990 – Incumbent |
Latest Govt Job & Exam Updates: