List of Presidents of France :
01 |
Louis-Napoléon Bonaparte |
Term of Office | 20 December 1848 2 December 1852 |
02 |
Adolphe Thiers |
Term of Office | 31 August 1871 -24 May 1873 |
03 |
Patrice de Mac Mahon |
Term of Office | 24 May 1873 – 30 January 1879 |
04 |
Jules Grévy |
Term of Office | 30 January 1879 – 2 December 1987 |
05 |
Sadi Carnot |
Term of Office | 3 December 1887 – 25 June 1894 |
06 |
Jean Casimir-Perier |
Term of Office | 27 June 1894 – 16 January 1895 |
07 |
Félix Faure |
Term of Office | 17 January 1895 – 16 February 1899 |
08 |
Émile Loubet |
Term of Office | 18 February 1899 – 18 February 1906 |
09 |
Armand Fallières |
Term of Office | 18 February 1906 -18 February 1913 |
10 |
Raymond Poincaré |
Term of Office | 18 February 1913 – 18 February 1920 |
11 |
Paul Deschanel |
Term of Office | 18 February 1920 – 21 September 1920 |
12 |
Alexandre Millerand |
Term of Office | 23 September 1920 – 11 June 1924 |
13 |
Gaston Doumergue |
Term of Office | 13 June 1924 – 13 June 1931 |
14 |
Paul Doumer |
Term of Office | 13 June 1931 – 7 May 1932 |
15 |
Albert Lebrun |
Term of Office | 10 May 1932 – 11 July 1940 |
16 |
Vincent Auriol |
Term of Office | 16 January 1947 – 16 January 1954 |
17 |
René Coty |
Term of Office | 16 January 1954 – 8 January 1959 |
18 |
Charles de Gaulle |
Term of Office | 8 January 1959 – 28 April 1969 |
19 |
Georges Pompidou |
Term of Office | 20 June 1969 – 2 April 1974 |
20 |
Valéry Giscard d’Estaing |
Term of Office | 20 June 1969 – 2 April 1974 |
21 |
François Mitterrand |
Term of Office | 21 May 1981 – 17 May 1995 |
22 |
Jacques Chirac |
Term of Office | 17 May 1995 – 16 May 2007 |
23 |
Nicolas Sarkozy |
Term of Office | 16 May 2007 – 15 May 2012 |
24 |
François Hollande |
Term of Office | 15 May 2012 – 14 May 2017 |
25 |
Emmanuel Macron |
Term of Office | 14 May 2017 |
Latest Govt Job & Exam Updates: