List of Presidents of South Korea :
01 |
Rhee Syng-man |
Term of Office | 24 July 1948 – 27 April 1960 |
02 |
Yun Bo-seon |
Term of Office | 12 August 1960 – 24 March 1962 |
03 |
Park Chung-hee |
Term of Office | 24 March 1962 – 26 October 1979 |
04 |
Choi Kyu-hah |
Term of Office | 6 December 1979 – 16 August 1980 |
05 |
Chun Doo-hwan |
Term of Office | 1 September 1980 – 24 February 1988 |
06 |
Roh Tae-woo |
Term of Office | 25 February 1988 – 24 February 1993 |
07 |
Kim Young-sam |
Term of Office | 25 February 1993 – 24 February 1998 |
08 |
Kim Dae-jung |
Term of Office | 25 February 1998 – 24 February 2003 |
09 |
Roh Moo-hyun |
Term of Office | 25 February 2003 – 24 February 2008 |
10 |
Lee Myung-bak |
Term of Office | 25 February 2008 – 24 February 2013 |
11 |
Park Geun-hye |
Term of Office | 25 February 2013 – 10 March 2017 |
12 |
Moon Jae-in |
Term of Office | 10 May 2017 (Term expires on 10 May 2022) |
Latest Govt Job & Exam Updates: